Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Use of Spouse's Sperm - Exception
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations must provide benefits for expenses arising from in vitro fertilization procedures; providing an exception to the required use of a spouse's sperm to fertilize the oocytes of a patient whose spouse is of the opposite sex; and providing the Act shall apply to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, renewed, or in force in the State on or after July 1, 2016.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0001
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
7/14/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {676081/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-20)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-8)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 7/14/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {676081/1 Report Adopted 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (116-20) 28
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Finance 28
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (37-8) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-810 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM