Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Judges - Election, Retention, and Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to provide for retention elections for judges of the circuit courts; proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution altering the mandatory retirement age for certain judges under certain circumstances; proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to increase the number of years between successive retention elections for judges of the Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals; etc.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2019
Legislative Date
10/15/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Judges - Election, Retention, and Mandatory Retirement Age
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
House 10/15/2019 10/15/2019 Pre-filed
Text - First - Judges - Election, Retention, and Mandatory Retirement Age
House 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM