Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Sponsored by
Delegates Hartman, Boyce, Patterson, Love, Hettleman, Lierman, and Arentz
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly and intentionally releasing or causing to be released, or organizing the release of, a certain balloon into the atmosphere; authorizing the Department to delegate certain enforcement authority to a certain unit, officer, or official of a local government; requiring a certain unit, officer, or official of a local government with delegated enforcement authority to report certain violations to the Department; establishing a maximum civil penalty of $250 for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0028
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/17/2019
Legislative Date
9/17/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/17/2019 9/17/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2301 )
Last Updated: 1/17/2020 11:54 AM