Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Influence on Collective Bargaining – Prohibition on Use of Public Funds and Income Tax Addition Modification
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a unit of State, county, or municipal government from knowingly using public funds to influence certain decisions of certain employees relating to collective bargaining; requiring an addition modification under the Maryland income tax for certain expenses to assist, promote, or deter collective bargaining; applying certain provisions of the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/15/2020
Legislative Date
9/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/15/2020 9/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
Text - First - Influence on Collective Bargaining – Prohibition on Use of Public Funds and Income Tax Addition Modification
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:43 PM