Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hunting Licenses - Exemption for Retired Members of the Armed Forces
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell and S. Howard
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating an exemption for a person who is a retired former member of the armed forces of the United States from the requirement to obtain a hunting license under specified circumstances; providing that the exemption applies only to hunting on specified farmland that is under specified ownership; and requiring a person who hunts under the exemption to possess a retired-military identification card, specified written permission to hunt from the property owner, and any required hunting stamps.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1547 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/17/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2015
Legislative Date
1/15/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2015
Legislative Date
1/20/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2015
Legislative Date
1/20/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {880514/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/17/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/15/2015 1/15/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/20/2015 1/20/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 1/20/2015 1/20/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {880514/1 Report Adopted 25
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 27
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM