Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance – Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders – Coverage
Sponsored by
Delegate Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, beginning on January 1, 2020, to provide services for certain pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders under certain circumstances; requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide certain health insurance benefits under certain insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage for certain diagnosis, evaluation, and treatment of certain pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/20/2018
Legislative Date
11/20/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/20/2018 11/20/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance – Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders – Coverage
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-854 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:22 AM