Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Facilities Security Improvements Program
Sponsored by
Delegates McDermott and Smigiel
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Public School Facilities Security Improvements Program; requiring the Interagency Committee on Public School Construction to implement and administer the Program and to develop procedures to provide grants to county boards to improve security in public school facilities; authorizing the Interagency Committee to award grants to improve security in public school facilities under specified circumstances; requiring the Governor to provide a specified amount in the State budget for the Program in fiscal year 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0470
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
10/01/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 10/01/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM