Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Destitute Adults - Extraordinary Medical Expenses for Developmental Disabilities and Civil Action
Sponsored by
Delegate Chang
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding the extraordinary medical expenses of a destitute adult child with a developmental disability to the support required from the destitute adult child's parent if the parent has or is able to earn sufficient means to provide the support; providing that a court may divide the support obligation for the extraordinary medical expenses of a destitute adult child with a developmental disability between the destitute adult child's parents in proportion to the parents' income; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0079
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/04/2016
Legislative Date
11/04/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/04/2016 11/04/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Destitute Adults - Extraordinary Medical Expenses for Developmental Disabilities and Civil Action
House 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/19 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101 through 13-103, 13-107, 13-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM