Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Student Health - Certificate of Dental Health
Sponsored by
Delegate Harrison
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, each student enrolled in a public elementary or secondary school in the State to submit a certificate of dental health to the school on a schedule established by the Department; and requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, to adopt certain regulations and to develop and disseminate a standard form for a certificate of dental health to county boards of education and certain parents and guardians.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/02/2019
Legislative Date
10/02/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Health - Certificate of Dental Health
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 10/02/2019 10/02/2019 Pre-filed
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Health - Certificate of Dental Health
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-402.1 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM