Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsored by
Delegates Arora, Kipke, Bromwell, Krebs, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Ready, and Tarrant
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the effective date of specified regulations adopted under the Administrative Procedure Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0261
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
9/26/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {396280/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 9/26/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments {396280/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 43
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM