Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Equestrian Day
Sponsored by
Delegate S. Howard
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the day designated for the final race of the Triple Crown of Thoroughbred Racing as Equestrian Day.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0660 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/18/2016
Legislative Date
10/18/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Equestrian Day
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/18/2016 10/18/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Equestrian Day
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-410, 7-410 through 7-417 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM