Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling Places
Sponsored by
Delegate Reznik
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the General Assembly to provide by suitable enactment a process to allow a qualified voter to register and vote on election day at a specified polling place in a specified precinct or on a specified day before election day at a specified polling place; making a stylistic change; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0518
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0732 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/11/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 10/11/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM