Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial Information
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring public senior higher education institutions and community colleges in the State to provide specified information on the cost of higher education at the institution to all first-time, full-time undergraduate freshmen beginning in the 2014-2015 academic year.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0074
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
11/13/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {924066/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/13/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {924066/1 Report Adopted 25
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (119-0) 27
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 26
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-118 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM