Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Improve Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers Scores for Maryland Public School Students
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Improve Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Scores for Maryland Public School Students; requiring the Task Force to identify the best practices of specified local school systems, assess specified needs, design specified plans, and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to submit a final report of its findings to the Governor, the State Board of Education, and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/13/2016
Legislative Date
10/13/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/13/2016 10/13/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Task Force to Improve Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers Scores for Maryland Public School Students
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM