Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Clark, Jameson, and Fisher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the nonrefundable $100 fee charged by the State Department of Assessments and Taxation for processing articles of dissolution and certificates of cancellation filed by certain business entities with the Department.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0993
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0656 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/09/2017
Legislative Date
11/09/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/09/2017 11/09/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM