Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Operating Budget - Publication of Expenditures
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a public body to submit to the Department of Budget and Management a report of each expenditure by the public body; providing for the contents and format of the report; requiring that expenditures of $50,000 or greater be reported within 90 days of the expenditure and lesser amounts within 180 days; requiring the Department of Information Technology, in consultation with the Department of Budget and Management, to develop and operate a website accessible to the public at no cost through the Internet; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/06/2019
Legislative Date
9/06/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Operating Budget - Publication of Expenditures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/06/2019 9/06/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Operating Budget - Publication of Expenditures
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:31 PM
Click to return on the top page