Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Truant Students - System of Active Intervention - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the system of active intervention for specified truant students developed by each county board of education to include an Individualized Reengagement Plan for each truant student, coordination and collaboration with State and municipal agencies to deliver services, creation of a database to track truant students, and a specific plan for each public school to reengage truant students; requiring the Individualized Reengagement Plan to be developed by specified individuals using a specified process; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0164
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0363 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/20/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/16/2015
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/20/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/16/2015 1/16/2015 Hearing 1/28 at 2:15 p.m.
House 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-302.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM