Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Building Performance Standards - Local Amendments to Fire Sprinkler Systems Provisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Adams, Otto, Ghrist, Arentz, and Buckel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the prohibition on a local jurisdiction adopting specified amendments to the Maryland Building Performance Standards regarding fire sprinkler systems in townhouses and one- and two-family dwellings; requiring that if a local jurisdiction adopts local amendments weakening the Maryland Building Performance Standards regarding fire sprinkler systems, the local amendment shall require that a builder provide the buyer with information and, if requested, install a fire suppression system at the buyer's expense; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/02/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/14/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 11/02/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/14/2016 1/14/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-504, 12-504.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM