Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Education - Required Number of School Days or Hours
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the requirement that certain public schools be open for at least 180 days and a minimum of 1,080 hours during a 10-month period in each school year to require that the schools be open for at least 180 days or a minimum of 1,080 hours during a 10-month period in each school year; and providing that certain funding for schools may not be reduced if there are fewer than 1,080 school hours under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1043 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/18/2019
Legislative Date
9/18/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Required Number of School Days or Hours
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/18/2019 9/18/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Required Number of School Days or Hours
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM