Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the definitions of "escrow agent" and "trust money" for purposes of a requirement that an escrow agent enter into a certain agreement with the seller and the buyer of residential real estate when the escrow agent agrees to hold trust money; defining "residential real estate" as real property improved by four or fewer single-family dwellings intended for human habitation and unimproved real property zoned for residential use; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/02/2020
Legislative Date
10/02/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/02/2020 10/02/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:43 PM