Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Maximum Assessment
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the maximum assessment of a dwelling against which the homeowners' property tax credit may be granted.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/03/2017
Legislative Date
8/03/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Maximum Assessment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/03/2017 8/03/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Maximum Assessment
House 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM