Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic and Paralympic Games Medals and Prizes
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the value of any medals awarded by the International Olympic Committee or the International Paralympic Committee and the amount of any prize money or honoraria that is received from the United States Olympic Committee that is the result of a performance at the Olympic Games or the Paralympic Games; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0053
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/19/2016
Legislative Date
9/19/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/19/2016 9/19/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic and Paralympic Games Medals and Prizes
House 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM