Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Streaming and Archiving - Open Meetings
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to make available to the public on the Internet live video streaming of each open meeting of the authority held at the Authority's headquarters or any other location where the authority held at least 10 meetings in the preceding calendar year; requiring the Authority to make available to the public on the Internet complete and unedited archived video recordings of streamed open meetings; and requiring the Authority to make the archived video recordings available for a minimum of 4 years.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/03/2018
Legislative Date
7/03/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {766485/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/03/2018 7/03/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Streaming and Archiving - Open Meetings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {766485/1 Adopted 40
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Streaming and Archiving - Open Meetings
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Finance 42
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM