Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsored by
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making provisions of law authorizing access to birth and adoption records by specified adoptees and biological parents applicable to adoptions in which a juvenile court entered an order for adoption before January 1, 2000; repealing provisions of law limiting, under specified circumstances, access to specified information in birth and adoption records by adoptees and biological parents for adoptions in which a juvenile court entered an order for adoption on or after January 1, 2000, except under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0165
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0719 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/20/2012
Legislative Date
11/01/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/20/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2013
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/20/2012 11/01/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/20/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/08/2013 1/08/2013 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2013 2/11/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-321, 5-339, 5-351, 5-359, 5-3A-19, 5-3A-35, 5-3A-42, 5-3B-21, 5-3B-29, 5-4B-01, 5-4B-02, 5-4B-11 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM