Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Privacy of Education Records and Personal Information of Students
Sponsored by
Delegate Schulz
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Department of Education, the State Board of Education, a county board of education, a local school system, a primary school, or a secondary school to collect or disclose the education records or personally identifiable information contained in the education records of a student only as necessary or required for specified purposes; prohibiting a person from requiring a specified student, without prior written consent, to submit to a survey, an analysis, or an evaluation that reveals specified information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/19/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/19/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-1701 through 7-1706 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM