Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Reassigned to Judiciary and Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an officer, an employee, an agent, or a contractor of the State or a political subdivision to deny inspection by a federal agency seeking access for certain immigration enforcement matters of a public record that contains personal information or certain photographic images unless a valid warrant is provided; requiring law enforcement agencies operating certain databases to require certain individuals accessing the databases to provide certain information; requiring a certain annual report to the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0234
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/13/2020
Legislative Date
7/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
4 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/13/2020 7/13/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Reassigned to Judiciary Environment and Transportation 4 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 1/31/2021 4:46 PM
Click to return on the top page