Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Public Schools - Active Assailant Event Training and Drills
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore County Superintendent of Schools to conduct active assailant event training for school personnel in Baltimore County each school year; requiring the Baltimore County Superintendent to require certain public schools to hold an active assailant event drill three times each school year; requiring certain training and drills to comply with guidelines established by the United States Department of Homeland Security or be consistent with available best practices; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0193 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/19/2017
Legislative Date
7/19/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2018
Legislative Date
1/09/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/19/2017 7/19/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County - Public Schools - Active Assailant Event Training and Drills
House 1/09/2018 1/09/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing canceled
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-441 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM