Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island
Sponsored by
Dorchester County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating an exception from motor vehicle registration requirements under certain circumstances for golf carts on Upper or Middle Hoopers Island; providing that a person who operates a golf cart on a highway on Upper or Middle Hoopers Island may operate the golf cart only on highways on which the maximum speed limit does not exceed 30 miles per hour, between dawn and dusk, and only if the golf cart is equipped with certain lighting devices; requiring a person who operates a golf cart in certain areas to keep as far right as feasible; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0094
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/16/2019
Legislative Date
10/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/16/2019 10/16/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-402, 21-104.5 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:31 PM