Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Overdose Response Program - Educational Training Program Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Szeliga and Cassilly
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring educational training for an Overdose Response Program overseen by the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to include training in the requirement to immediately contact medical services after the administration of naloxone by a certificate holder instead of training in the importance of contacting emergency medical services.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/06/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 11/06/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3102, 13-3104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM