Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Catastrophic Health Emergencies – Health Care Providers – Definition and Immunity (Maryland Health Care Heroes Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "health care provider" for purposes of certain provisions of law governing catastrophic health emergencies to include an employee, an agent, or a contractor of a health care facility who provides or assists in the provision of health care services; specifying the acts and omissions for which and altering the circumstances under which a health care provider has civil and criminal immunity related to a catastrophic health emergency; applying the Act retroactively; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0311
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/27/2020
Legislative Date
10/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2021
Legislative Date
1/07/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/27/2020 10/27/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Text - First - Catastrophic Health Emergencies – Health Care Providers – Definition and Immunity (Maryland Health Care Heroes Protection Act)
House 1/07/2021 1/07/2021 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 4:19 PM
Click to return on the top page