Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Healthy Air Act
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Lewis and Robinson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Committee on Air Quality to create an air quality sampling and monitoring protocol, on or before January 1, 2019, for the collection of air quality and public health data associated with certain large animal-feeding operations; requiring the protocol to establish the methodology for the Department of the Environment to use to quantify and assess certain data; requiring the Department to report its findings from certain assessments and evaluations to the General Assembly by December 15, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0133
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/15/2017
Legislative Date
11/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Healthy Air Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/15/2017 11/15/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Community Healthy Air Act
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing canceled
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM