Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Ranked Choice Voting and Open Primaries
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to adopt, by law, a ranked choice voting system or an open primary system for elections for certain city offices; requiring that certain procedures apply to an open primary system; authorizing a local law implementing ranked choice voting or open primaries to provide for certain matters; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to provide for the ballot format to be used in an election conducted by ranked choice voting; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/20/2018
Legislative Date
8/20/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Ranked Choice Voting and Open Primaries
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/20/2018 8/20/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore City - Ranked Choice Voting and Open Primaries
House 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-101, 8-201, 9-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM