Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Attendance of Students - Lawful Absences - Mental Illness
Sponsored by
Delegate Chang
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that a student's absence from school due to the student's mental illness is a lawful absence; requiring each county board of education to develop a certain attendance policy for students with mental illness that may identify a certain number of absences allowed within a marking period, semester, or school year; and requiring each county board to publish its attendance policy for students with mental illness on the county board's website.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/29/2019
Legislative Date
7/29/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Attendance of Students - Lawful Absences - Mental Illness
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2020
Legislative Date
1/07/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/29/2019 7/29/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Attendance of Students - Lawful Absences - Mental Illness
House 1/07/2020 1/07/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-301.3 )
Last Updated: 1/30/2020 2:49 PM