Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding the sale, transfer, or other disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center property; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the General Assembly, and other specified entities on or before January 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/12/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2015
Legislative Date
1/15/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2015
Legislative Date
1/20/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2015
Legislative Date
1/20/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {190012/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {127977/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/12/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/15/2015 1/15/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/20/2015 1/20/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 1/20/2015 1/20/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {190012/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Finance 37
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {127977/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM