Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Qualified Opportunity Zones
Sponsored by
Delegates Szeliga and Arikan
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for certain construction material or warehousing equipment purchased solely for use in a qualified opportunity zone in Baltimore County under certain circumstances; requiring a buyer claiming the exemption to provide a vendor evidence of eligibility issued by the Comptroller; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0185
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/29/2019
Legislative Date
7/29/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2020
Legislative Date
1/07/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/29/2019 7/29/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Qualified Opportunity Zones
House 1/07/2020 1/07/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-236 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM