Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses Confiscated for Real ID Compliance – Issuance and Display of Recall Notice
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an exception to certain requirements that an individual possess or display a driver's license under certain circumstances if the individual's license has been confiscated by a law enforcement officer within the previous 90 days for failure to submit certain documents to the Motor Vehicle Administration; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0173
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/29/2019
Legislative Date
7/29/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {270111/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/29/2019 7/29/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses Confiscated for Real ID Compliance – Failure to Possess or Display
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {270111/1 Adopted 35
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses Confiscated for Real ID Compliance – Issuance and Display of Recall Notice
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/25/2020 4:53 PM