Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property as an independent unit in the Executive Branch; placing the Commission under the Department of General Services for administrative and budgetary purposes; authorizing the Commission to sell, transfer, or otherwise dispose of specified property and enter into contracts and execute specified instruments to carry out its purpose; terminating the Act on June 30, 2018; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
9/28/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {930914/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 9/28/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable with Amendments {930914/1 Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
House 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 53
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 51
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM