Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays
Sponsored by
Delegate S. Howard
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to adopt specified regulations restricting a tidal fish licensee who catches crabs using trotline gear to a workday of at least 10 hours on specified holidays if the Department authorizes the workday to begin earlier than 1 hour before sunrise.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1595 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/19/2016
Legislative Date
10/19/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/19/2016 10/19/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM