Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Substance Use Disorder
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering certain circumstances to allow a petition for an emergency evaluation to be made for certain individuals who have a substance use disorder; altering a certain exception to allow for the invountary admission of certain individuals who have a substance use disorder to certain facilities or a Veterans' Administration hospital; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/12/2020
Legislative Date
10/12/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/12/2020 10/12/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Substance Use Disorder
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:44 PM