Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Repeal of Constitutional Amendment - Changes to Statutory Provisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Smigiel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing Article XIX - Video Lottery Terminals of the Maryland Constitution; submitting this amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; specifying in statutory law that the primary purpose of the operation of video lottery terminals is to raise revenue for specified public education goals; and requiring in statutory law that a video lottery facility comply with all applicable planning and zoning laws of the local jurisdiction.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
7/27/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 7/27/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-02, 9-1A-03, 9-1A-05, 9-1A-11, 9-1A-36 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM