Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charges Disposed of by Nolle Prosequi, Dismissal, or Acquittal - Case Search
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Judiciary Case Search from referring in any way to the existence of a specific criminal charge more than 5 years after the charge has been disposed of by nolle prosequi, dismissal, or acquittal.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/26/2017
Legislative Date
7/26/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/26/2017 7/26/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Charges Disposed of by Nolle Prosequi, Dismissal, or Acquittal - Case Search
House 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM