Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Weapons on School Property - School Resource Officer
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that the prohibition on carrying or possessing a firearm, knife, or deadly weapon of any kind on public school property does not apply to a school resource officer who is assigned to a public school in Baltimore City and is on public school property in Baltimore City.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/20/2018
Legislative Date
11/20/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Weapons on School Property - School Resource Officer
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/20/2018 11/20/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Baltimore City - Weapons on School Property - School Resource Officer
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-102 )
(   7-1501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM