Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Restoring and Sustaining Baltimore City Communities Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegate Haynes
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a specified property tax credit against the property tax imposed on specified property located in specified communities in Baltimore City; establishing the amount and duration of the property tax credit; providing for the eligibility requirements of the property tax credit; providing the Act shall be applicable to all taxable years beginning on or after June 30, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
8/20/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 8/20/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM