Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Certified Associate Counselors-Alcohol and Drug and Certified Supervised Counselors-Alcohol and Drug - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an applicant, in order to qualify as a certified associate counselor-alcohol and drug or a certified supervised counselor-alcohol and drug, to complete supervised work experience as specified in regulation in lieu of satisfying a certain internship requirement; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0015
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1652 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/21/2017
Legislative Date
7/21/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/21/2017 7/21/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Certified Associate Counselors-Alcohol and Drug and Certified Supervised Counselors-Alcohol and Drug - Qualifications
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-403, 17-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM