Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Projects and Public Purpose Projects
Sponsored by
Delegate Vitale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Community Development Administration to get approval of the land use for a community development project or a public purpose project by the appropriate governing body of the political subdivision in which a proposed community development project or a public purpose project is located in a specified manner; requiring the Administration to provide notice and an opportunity to comment to the appropriate governing body rather than to specified officials; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/19/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2015
Legislative Date
1/15/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/19/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/15/2015 1/15/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM