Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Account Withdrawals for Higher Education Tuition
Sponsored by
Delegate Afzali
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the State income tax for the amount received from specified qualified retirement plans if the amount is used to pay for tuition for specified individuals at an institution of higher education in the State; requiring a taxpayer to file, with the taxpayer's tax return, a statement from the institution of higher education certifying the amount of tuition paid during the taxable year; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/31/2016
Legislative Date
8/31/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/31/2016 8/31/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Account Withdrawals for Higher Education Tuition
House 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207, 10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM