Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Voluntary Admission to Mental Facility
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 760
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain disabled person to apply for voluntary admission to a mental facility if the person submits a formal written application and either a physician and a psychologist, two physicians, or a physician and a psychiatric nurse practioner provide a certain certification; requiring the facility to notify the guardian of the person of a disabled person that the disabled person has been admitted to the facility and of a certain request for discharge from the facility; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/01/2017
Legislative Date
8/01/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {976987/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 760
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/01/2017 8/01/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Voluntary Admission to Mental Facility
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {976987/1 Adopted 26
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
Text - Third - Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Voluntary Admission to Mental Facility
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 28
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Referred Finance 29
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 760
Text - Chapter - Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Voluntary Admission to Mental Facility
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-706, 13-708 )
(   10-609, 10-611 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM