Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult - Causing Severe Emotional Distress
Sponsored by
Delegates Guyton, Healey, C. Watson, Brooks, Bagnall, Feldmark, Palakovich Carr, and Bartlett
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a certain person from causing abuse or neglect of a vulnerable adult that causes severe emotional distress to the vulnerable adult; and altering the definition of "abuse" of a vulnerable adult by adding deceptive or misleading statements made with a malicious intent toward the vulnerable adult, destruction or harm to an animal owned by a vulnerable adult, and the malicious distribution, display, or transmission of information about the vulnerable adult on social media without permission.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0153
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/04/2019
Legislative Date
9/04/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/04/2019 9/04/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult - Causing Severe Emotional Distress
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM