Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Return Preparers - False Returns or Claims for Refund - Statute of Limitations
Sponsored by
Delegate McDermott
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an income tax return preparer who willfully prepares, assists in preparing, or causes the preparation of a false income tax return or claim for refund under specified circumstances is subject to a specified statute of limitations and may reserve a point or question for a specified judicial review.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0967 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
10/01/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 10/01/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1004 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM