Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Distribution of Controlled Dangerous Substance Near Methadone Clinic - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Cassilly and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from illegally manufacturing, distributing, dispensing, or possessing with intent to distribute a controlled dangerous substance or conspiring to do so in, on, or within 1,000 feet of real property owned or leased by an entity licensed by the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to serve as a methadone clinic or to provide opioid maintenance therapy or treatment; providing for the applicability of the Act; providing penalties for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/06/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 11/06/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-627.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM